SUSSEX MARK BENEVOLENT FUND, CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sussex Mark Benevolent Fund operates for the benefit of such distressed Brother Mark Master Masons of the Province of Sussex, their widows, children, and dependents or for the benefit of such other Masonic Charities or other charitable institutions, societies or organisations as the Trustees shall decide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 27 May 2020: CIO registration
- 16 August 2021: Funds received from 1090369 THE SUSSEX MARK BENEVOLENT FUND
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL JOHN MARCHANT | Chair | 22 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Rae Campbell | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Leonard Verco | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Alfred Jackson | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin Stanley Ballard | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Brian Dumigan | Trustee | 22 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
ALAN CHARLES HOBDEN | Trustee | 22 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
IVOR MICHAEL HENRY BENNETT | Trustee | 22 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Farrow | Trustee | 22 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROGER FRANCIS RICHARDSON | Trustee | 22 May 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.47k | £17.36k | £20.40k | £21.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.75k | £27.95k | £22.95k | £18.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 May 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH DISTRESSED BROTHER MARK MASTER MASONS OF THE PROVINCE OF SUSSEX, THEIR WIDOWS, CHILDREN AND DEPENDANTS OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH OTHER MASONIC CHARITIES OR OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS, SOCIETIES OR ORGANISATIONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
78 Annandale Avenue
BOGNOR REGIS
West Sussex
PO21 2EX
- Phone:
- 07831421235
- Website:
-
sussexmark.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window