SHOUT WSK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SHOUT WSK provides engagement and emergency food for the homeless and vulnerable community in Worthing and surrounding areas. We received our registered charity status in September 2020. Our aim is to work towards making homelessness in Worthing a thing of the past. We are a member of the Worthing Food Poverty Network and Community Works. We are also registered with Worthing and Adur Council
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £5,837 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
125 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- West Sussex
Governance
- 15 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEITH DERICK RILEY SUNDERLAND | Chair | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Allan James Starr Hedley | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN EDWARD BISHOP | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Aaron Francis Burns | Trustee | 15 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.80k | £91.47k | £113.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.70k | £80.33k | £112.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £18.47k | £11.85k | £5.84k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OF PEOPLE WHO ARE HOMELESS, AT RISK OF HOMELESSNESS OR RECOVERING FROM HOMELESSNESS IN SUSSEX BY WORKING AND LIAISING WITH OTHER AGENCIES TO PROVIDE LONG-TERM HOUSING SOLUTIONS. 2. TO RELIEVE THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WHO ARE HOMELESS, AT RISK OF HOMELESSNESS OR RECOVERING FROM HOMELESSNESS IN SUSSEX BY WORKING WITH SUCH PEOPLE AND OTHERS TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FOOD, ITEMS, SUPPORT, ADVICE AND SIGNPOSTING SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Shout WSK
35-36 New Broadway
WORTHING
West Sussex
BN11 4HP
- Phone:
- 07734174467
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window