OAK HILL ASD CHILDCARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We created Oak Hill ASD Childcare as an incorporated charity and our mission is to offer childcare for children with Autism Spectrum Disorder (ASD); ASD is a developmental disorder that affects the way a child communicates and behaves. It has associated difficulties such as communication delays, sensory needs, learning difficulties, challenging behaviour, etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Newport City
Governance
- 13 August 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gwen Vaughan Mrs | Chair | 10 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Claire Hawkins | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Andrew David Hopkins | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Amy Williams-Pring | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Stephen Martin Leadbetter | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Catherine Cains | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Jane Adele Weale | Trustee | 10 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Aji Gass Jarra | Trustee | 10 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.82k | £13.73k | £68.47k | £31.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.39k | £18.57k | £47.30k | £18.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £19.96k | £2.50k | £4.29k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 February 2025 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 February 2025 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 February 2022 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 February 2022 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FOR THE RECREATION AND CARE OF CHILDREN WITH ADDITIONAL AND COMPLEX NEEDS WITHIN THE NEWPORT LOCAL AUTHORITY AREA BY MAKING SERVICES AND FACILITIES AVAILABLE TO THEM DURING OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND SCHOOL HOLIDAYS AND PROVIDING APPROPRIATE TRAINING TO STAFF AND VOLUNTEERS TO ENABLE THEM TO DELIVER THE SERVICE SAFELY AND EFFECTIVELY.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ysgol Bryn Derw
Melfort Road
NEWPORT
NP20 3FQ
- Phone:
- 07790137687
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window