BIRDS OF PARADISE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working with our sister charity in Kenya to provide support to poverty stricken regions, including low income families, orphanages, the elderly, and single mothers. Our focus areas in terms of the support we provide are in Food, Education, Water, and Housing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hampshire
- Throughout London
- Kenya
Governance
- 27 October 2020: CIO registration
- BOP (Working name)
- BOP FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Muhammadali Macci | Chair | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tariq Kassam | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ilham Aboo | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
MUSHTAKALI MACCI | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.84k | £10.18k | £16.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.52k | £10.05k | £16.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN LONDON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS AND IN KENYA FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF ITEMS SUCH AS FOOD AND CLOTHING. (2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN LONDON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS AND IN KENYA BY THE SUPPLY OF BOOKS AND EDUCATIONAL EQUIPMENT. (3) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN KENYA BY MAKING GRANTS OF FUNDING TO PROVIDE COMMUNITIES WHICH ARE IN FINANCIAL HARDSHIP WITH THE SUPPLY OF CLEAN WATER.
Contact information
- Address:
-
57 Byron Road
WEMBLEY
Middlesex
HA0 3PB
- Phone:
- 07595748304
- Email:
- mmacci88@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window