THE ANCHORMEN DRUM AND BUGLE CORPS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TEACHING OF MUSIC, MARCHING, DANCE, COORDINATION AND OTHER RELEVANT ARTS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Calderdale
- Kirklees
Governance
- 18 May 1985: Standard registration
- 17 April 2023: Funds received from 1136920 SPICE COLOUR GUARD
- ANCHORMEN ENSEMBLE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TONY LEES | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Kemp | Trustee | 02 December 2017 |
|
|||||
MALCOLM DAVID WRAGG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILLIP HOWE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.71k | £27.76k | £40.44k | £46.78k | £41.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.48k | £18.76k | £27.79k | £54.88k | £48.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 NOVEMBER 1984
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CORPS IS TO ADVANCE, WITHIN A CHRISTIAN ENVIRONMENT, THE MUSICAL EDUCATION OF THE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE AREA OF THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF CALDERDALE AND IN PARTICULAR ELLAND, BY HELPING TO TRAIN THEM IN THE PLAYING OF MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS AND THE USE OF CORPS EQUIPMENT, AND BY MEANS OF CONCERTS AND EXHIBITIONS AT WHICH SUCH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE MAY PERFORM AS A CORPS, TO ADVANCE THE AESTHETIC EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF CALDERDALE, AND IN PARTICULAR, ELLAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Anchormen D & B Corps
The Wesley Centre
Eastgate
ELLAND
West Yorkshire
HX5 9DQ
- Phone:
- 07940244721
- Email:
- tony@anchormen.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window