NORWICH ZEN BUDDHIST PRIORY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NORWICH ZEN BUDDHIST PRIORY PROMOTES THE PRACTICE OF SERENE REFLECTION MEDITATION (SOTO ZEN BUDDHISM). IT OFFERS TEACHING AND SUPPORT AND PROVIDES A PLACE WHERE PEOPLE CAN PRACTISE MEDITATION. THE SCHEDULE INCLUDES MEDITATION DAYS AND RETREATS, CEREMONIES AND TALKS/DISCUSSIONS ON BUDDHIST PRACTICE, AS WELL AS INTRODUCTORY EVENTS. THE PRIORY FUNCTIONS WITHIN THE ORDER OF BUDDHIST CONTEMPLATIVES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
- Norfolk
Governance
- 29 June 2020: CIO registration
- 09 December 2021: Funds received from 1155077 NORWICH BUDDHIST PRIORY
- NORWICH BUDDHIST PRIORY (Working name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Gillian Frances Houn Leoma Hague | Chair | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev MARY CAROLINE HOUN ALICIA ROWE | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER DAVID LOUKES | Trustee | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE MARY YEOMANS | Trustee | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £115.25k | £37.20k | £27.03k | £26.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.48k | £19.11k | £11.96k | £14.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE THE BUDDHIST RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES AND PRINCIPLES OF THE BUDDHIST FAITH, IN PARTICULAR THE SERENE REFLECTION MEDITATION SCHOOL OF BUDDHISM (ALSO KNOWN AS SOTO ZEN BUDDHISM). TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF MEDITATION AND THE TEACHINGS OF BUDDHISM, IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY SUPPORTING AND ENCOURAGING THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF BUDDHIST MEDITATION. EXCEPTING THE STUDY OF RELIGIONS FOR PURPOSES OF COMPARISON, ONLY THE SERENE REFLECTION MEDITATION SCHOOL OF BUDDHISM SHALL BE TAUGHT OR PRACTISED AT THE NORWICH ZEN BUDDHIST PRIORY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Hellesdon Road
NORWICH
NR6 5EB
- Phone:
- 01603 219464
- Email:
- info@norwichzen.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window