Accounts and annual returns BNJC

Charity number: 1195729
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 13 February 2025 289 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 13 February 2025 289 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 19 July 2023 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 19 July 2023 80 days late Download Open in new window