Accounts and annual returns LIFE CHILD FOUNDATION UK

Charity Number: 1193605
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 10 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 10 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2023 08 January 2024 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 08 January 2024 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 06 January 2023 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 06 January 2023 9 days late