Supermarine Seaplane

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Flying, preserving, and educating the historic S5 Supermarine seaplane. Encouraging youth into STEM and promoting British aviation heritage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 August 2020: CIO registration
- Supermarine Seaplane (Working name)
- SUPERMARINE S5 SEAPLANE (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Ellis Wood | Chair | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Keeping | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Hosie | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.35k | £62.00k | £49.83k | £49.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.35k | £62.00k | £50.96k | £50.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Aug 2020 as amended on 24 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF THE DESIGN AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE SUPERMARINE S5 SEAPLANE INCLUDING, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, THE BUILDING OF THE SEAPLANE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cider House
Allowenshay
HINTON ST. GEORGE
Somerset
TA17 8TB
- Phone:
- 07585663670
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window