CITY OF STOKE ATHLETICS AND COMMUNITY SPORTS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity exists to promote community participation in healthy recreation by providing facilities for athletics and other sports capable of improving fitness and health and to promote the education of the public, in particular children and young people, including their physical and academic education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Staffordshire
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 27 September 2021: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Williamson | Trustee | 27 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Eric Brannen | Trustee | 17 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Hendricken | Trustee | 17 August 2020 |
|
|||||
Duncan Graham Mathieson | Trustee | 17 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor William John Dixon | Trustee | 17 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £5.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £300 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 October 2024 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 October 2024 | 479 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 AUG 2020
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (OBJECTS) ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT GENERALLY BUT WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE INHABITANTS OF STOKE-ON-TRENT AND NORTH STAFFORDSHIRE: 3.1 TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR ATHLETICS AND SUCH OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING FITNESS AND HEALTH (FACILITIES IN THIS ARTICLE 3 (OBJECTS) MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES); 3.2 TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 3.3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR, CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE (INCLUDING THEIR PHYSICAL AND ACADEMIC EDUCATION) BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CITY OF STOKE-ON-TRENT
NORTHWOOD STADIUM
KEELINGS ROAD
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST1 6PA
- Phone:
- 007492091111
- Email:
- k.hendricken@sky.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window