FLOATY BOAT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Floaty Boat's vision is to enable folk to reduce the likelihood of reaching crisis point
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £6,770 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 21 September 2020: CIO registration
- FLOATY BOAT FUND (Working name)
- FLOATY BOATY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Margaret Lavender | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Helen Farrally | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gathorne James Gough | Trustee | 14 January 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.57k | £1.12k | £176 | £7.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.73k | £2.60k | £3.00k | £1.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | N/A | N/A | £6.77k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 September 2024 | 219 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 September 2024 | 219 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 March 2023 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 March 2023 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE LIVE-ABOARD BOATER COMMUNITY OF THE CANAL NETWORK OF BATH AND NORTH EAST SOMERSET, BERKSHIRE, BRISTOL AND WILTSHIRE AND THEIR LOCAL COMMUNITIES WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE THE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A MOBILE NARROWBOAT-BASED COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Floaty Boat HQ
Tudor Offices
7 The Shambles
Bradford on Avon
Wiltshire
BA15 1JS
- Phone:
- 07890147185
- Email:
- floatyboatfund@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window