HOWDEN AFC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing education and encourage physical development / health by provision of facilities and opportunities for playing football and other sports to people in Howden (East Yorkshire) and the surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £9,120 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
88 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 29 June 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert James Kirkham | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Clarke | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Lee Dillon | Trustee | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Andrew Holt | Trustee | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Anne Fitzpatrick | Trustee | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Keith Tinkler | Trustee | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £138.51k | £51.10k | £83.28k | £132.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.18k | £56.18k | £109.55k | £120.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £18.38k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £27.43k | N/A | £18.38k | £9.12k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BETWEEN THE AGES OF 6 AND 17 RESIDING IN HOWDEN AREA BY PROVIDING FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR PLAYING FOOTBALL SO AS TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE PHYSICAL DEVELOPMENT OF SUCH CHILDREN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GOSSCHALKS
61 QUEENS GARDENS
HULL
HU1 3DZ
- Phone:
- 07710776051
- Email:
- mail@howdenafc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window