DARLASTON MUSLIM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
* To promote the religion of Islam; * To provide facilities for congregational prayer for male and female worshippers; * To provide educational/spiritual facilities for all age groups; * To provide secure and safe facilities for childrens's education and activities; * To create an understanding between people of different faiths; * To promote peace and harmony within the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2006
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Walsall
Governance
- 13 March 1985: Standard registration
- THE PAKISTAN MUSLIM WELFARE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mazhar Hussain | Chair | 23 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED RASHID | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ARFAN HUSSAIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.26k | £9.59k | £8.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.28k | £5.27k | £6.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1214 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1214 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1579 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1579 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 DECEMBER 1984 AS AMENDED 4 FEBRUARY 2001
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE: THE PROPAGATION ADVANCEMENT AND PRACTICE OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION ACCORDING TO THE TENETS AND DOCTRINE OF AHL-E-SUNNAT-WALJAMAT AMONGST PERSONS AND MORE PARTICULARLY MUSLIMS RESIDENT WITHIN THE AREA OF DARLASTON IN THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF WALSALL AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF, BY THE PROVISIONS OF A MOSQUE AND BURIAL GROUND, BY THE HOLDING OF ORGANISED RELIGIOUS SERVICES INCLUDING BIRTH DEATH AND MARRIAGE RITES AND OTHER PRAYERS AND OF EDUCATION IN THE ISLAMIC FAITH.(FOR FURTHER DETAILS OF OBJECTS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF ABOVE CONSTITUTION)..
Area of benefit
DARLASTON AND NEIGHBOURHOOD IN THE BOROUGH OF WALSALL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
153 Walsall Road
Wednesbury
WS10 9SW
- Phone:
- 01215265167
- Email:
- dmtrust@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window