Accounts and annual returns REDCAR & CLEVELAND VOLUNTARY DEVELOPMENT AGENCY

Charity number: 516233
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 10 February 2011 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 16 December 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 21 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 17 December 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 07 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 07 January 2009 On Time