AMA CARES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We undertake community based activities which bring together parents, guardians, children and our consultants to educate them on issues pertaining child sexual abuse and offer techniques and guidelines on how to stop and or prevent such abuses. Professionals that support our activities include police, doctors, mental health personnel, social workers and self defence experts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Ghana
- Nigeria
- South Africa
- Togo
Governance
- 23 December 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DANIEL ASARE | Chair | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
DOUGLAS ADJEPONG | Trustee | 02 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Doris Adzam | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £116 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN/YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 6-18 YEARS OLD, WITH A FOCUS ON THE BAME COMMUNITY IN THE UK AND CHILDREN/YOUNG PEOPLE IN AFRICA EXPERIENCING OR AT RISK OF EXPERIENCING CHILDHOOD SEXUAL ABUSE OR TO PREVENT CHILDHOOD SEXUAL ABUSE THROUGH: A QUALIFIED PROFESSIONALS PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL COMMUNITY WORKSHOPS, ACTIVITIES, COUNSELLING AND MENTORING B RAISING AWARENESS TO HELP PREVENT CHILDHOOD SEXUAL ABUSE; C)PROVIDING HEALTH EDUCATION; D REFERRING BENEFICIARIES IN AFRICA TO THE APPROPRIATE HOSPITALS AND SEXUAL HEALTH TREATMENT CENTRES FOR TREATMENT AND SUPPORT; E)PROVIDING SUPPORT TO SOCIAL SERVICES AND APPROPRIATE BODIES IN AFRICA TO SUPPORT BENEFICIARIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
175 Harrow Road
WARLINGHAM
CR6 9EZ
- Phone:
- 03301332344
- Email:
- INFO@AMACARES.ORG
- Website:
-
WWW.AMACARES.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window