FIZZIKAL FUTURES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fizzikal Futures provide a range of ways for young people to connect with peers, primarily through sport and mostly through Football in Southall, West London. The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation by providing facilities for playing sport. The promotion of racial harmony amongst its service users by providing opportunities for young people to connect and engage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ealing
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 March 2025 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 March 2025 | 42 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO, BEING UNDERTAKEN IN THE DISTRICT OF SOUTHALL, IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF EALING AND THE SURROUNDING BOROUGHS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ARE AS FOLLOWS: 1) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AGED BETWEEN 11 AND 25, AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE FROM SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED BACKGROUNDS, THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. 2) THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL HARMONY AMONGST THE CIO'S SERVICE USERS AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY BY: (A) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE, DIALOGUE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIFFERENT RACIAL, TRIBAL AND CASTE GROUPS; (B) PROVIDING ACTIVITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES TO ENABLE PEOPLE FROM DIFFERENT RACIAL, TRIBAL AND CASTE GROUPS TO INTERACT IN A POSITIVE WAY.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window