RADIO BOBOLA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing Christian faith for the benefit of the public in accordance with the statement of faith, in particular but not exclusively by means of providing the communication, information and Christian values outreach platforms through on-line radio and video broadcasting programmes and podcasts, social media and internet as well as social and cultural events in Polish and English language.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
53 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Poland
- Scotland
- United States
Governance
- 07 September 2020: CIO registration
- RADIO BOBOLA (Working name)
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Remigiusz Farbotko | Chair | 09 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mikolaj Maksym Mikosik | Trustee | 02 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Marek Reczek | Trustee | 09 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.54k | £32.80k | £14.67k | £31.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.70k | £36.69k | £14.62k | £31.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 30 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 May 2024
(These accounts |
30 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 06 August 2024 | 128 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 25 February 2025 | 331 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 24 May 2023 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 05 June 2023 | 66 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 07 April 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 07 April 2022 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION TO ADVANCE AND EDUCATE IN THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY MEANS OF PROVIDING THE COMMUNICATION, INFORMATION AND CHRISTIAN VALUES OUTREACH PLATFORMS THROUGH ON-LINE RADIO AND VIDEO BROADCASTING PROGRAMMES AND PODCASTS, SOCIAL MEDIA AND INTERNET AS WELL AS SOCIAL AND CULTURAL EVENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Leysfield Road Hammersmith
LONDON
W12 9JF
- Phone:
- 07525621816
- Email:
- radio@stbobola.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window