FIELD OF GRACE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support anyone affected by an eating disorder, undiagnosed or not, by offering 1:1 check-ins and group support. This is both the sufferer and parent/carer. We also plan to educate schools and General Practioners.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 18 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Leach | Chair | 18 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Leach | Trustee | 18 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Roy Wilson | Trustee | 18 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2021 | 06/04/2022 | 06/04/2023 | 06/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £1.00k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £162 | £126 | £408 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 01 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | 01 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2021 | 05 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE BY ANY CHARITABLE MEANS TO THOSE SUFFERING FROM, OR AT RISK OF SUFFERING FROM, ANOREXIA NERVOSA, BULIMIA NERVOSA, BINGE EATING, COMPULSIVE EATING OR ANY OTHER EATING DISORDER BY PROVIDING SUPPORT, INFORMATION & ADVICE. 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC ABOUT ANY EATING DISORDERS BY PROVIDING TRAINING TO PROFESSIONALS, INFORMATION TO SCHOOLS & THE WIDER COMMUNITY TO RAISE AWARENESS & PREVENTION MEASURES WHERE POSSIBLE. 3. THE PRESERVATION & PROTECTION OF THE PHYSICAL & MENTAL HEALTH OF FAMILIES, CARERS & ANYONE ELSE AFFECTED BY THOSE SUFFERING FROM ANY EATING DISORDER BY PROVIDING INFORMATION, ADVICE & SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 Francis Way
CAMBERLEY
GU15 1EX
- Phone:
- 07557531102
- Email:
- fieldofgracesurrey@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window