THE DARWIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's key focus is on contributing to the global development of 'intelligent sustainability' through the promotion and development of education, research and associated activities concerning natural sciences. It combines its own initiatives with financial support for charitable projects led by other organisations that satisfy its published criteria.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Ecuador
- France
- Ireland
- Malaysia
- Namibia
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
Governance
- 03 August 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Marchant | Chair | 10 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Robert Capewell | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louis-James Davis | Trustee | 10 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 24 February 2025 | 330 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 24 February 2025 | 330 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
1. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY ENCOURAGING, FOSTERING AND SUPPORTING THE ACTIVE ENGAGEMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE ENJOYMENT AND STUDY OF ZOOLOGY, BOTANY AND GEOLOGY IN RELATION TO THE MANAGEMENT OF NATURAL RESOURCES IN ANY LOCATION. 2. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO CONTRIBUTE TO THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING, MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE, CONCERNING THE APPLICATION OF ZOOLOGICAL, BOTANICAL AND GEOLOGICAL KNOWLEDGE IN THE MANAGEMENT OF NATURAL RESOURCES IN ANY LOCATION. 3. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY FOSTERING AND SUPPORTING THE INFORMAL AND FORMAL STUDY OF ZOOLOGY, BOTANY AND GEOLOGY THROUGH THE USE OF APPROPRIATE TECHNOLOGIES AND THE SUPPLY WITHOUT CHARGE OF INFORMATION, EDUCATION AND RESEARCH SERVICES AND GRANTS DIRECTED IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TOWARDS FOR YOUNG PEOPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
High Burrells
Burrells
APPLEBY-IN-WESTMORLAND
Cumbria
CA16 6EG
- Phone:
- 07855341250
- Email:
- mike@therttg.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window