OPEN PALM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing educational resources to underfunded schools or individuals. Providing skills-based educational programmes to under 18s. Promoting racial equality and racial harmony through awareness initiatives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 01 July 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ralph Orena McBaiden | Chair | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jaisha Bruce | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roshan Ramlugun | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lynette Emesibe | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Amelia McBaiden | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.07k | £49.41k | £15.48k | £53.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.14k | £5.95k | £14.75k | £63.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 22 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 22 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, ARE: 1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THOSE IN NEED IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD, IN PARTICULAR BY THE SUPPLY OF EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES TO SCHOOLS, THE PROVISION OF FUNDING FOR SCHOOLS AND/OR THOSE WITH EDUCATIONAL NEEDS AND THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES TO THOSE IN NEED. 2. THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL HARMONY BY: (A) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS; (C) WORKING TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE. 3. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING WORKSHOPS AND TRAINING COVERING BASIC LIFE SKILLS AND SUBJECTS OF EDUCATIONAL VALUE, INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, FINANCIAL MANAGEMENT AND ECONOMIC PRINCIPLES, COMMUNICATION AND LEADERSHIP SKILLS, THE LAW AND THE CRIMINAL JUSTICE SYSTEM, EMPLOYMENT SKILLS, AND HEALTHY RELATIONSHIPS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Open Palm
86-90 Paul Street
London
EC2A 4NE
- Phone:
- 02038664433
- Email:
- info@openpalm.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window