BURNHAM RESILIENCE CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Burnham Resilience CIO helps residents of the civic parish of Burnham to build and develop community capacity and to develop good citizenship through volunteer based activities and by providing support and assistance for residents
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2022
Total income includes £8 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- BURNHAM RESILIENCE GROUP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.40k | £40 | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.70k | £228 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £670 | £8 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 27 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 27 August 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE CIVIC PARISH OF BURNHAM, BUCKINGHAMSHIRE IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT, WITH PARTICULAR FOCUS IN THE IMMEDIATE FUTURE ON PROVIDING ASSISTANCE TO THOSE AFFECTED BY CORONAVIRUS (COVID-19): THE RELIEF OF THOSE RESIDENTS OF THE PARISH, WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, OR SOCIAL DISADVANTAGE, OR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN; OR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window