Prept. Foundation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public, in particular children and young people, in food and nutrition so as to develop their knowledge and understanding of food, food origins, food from different cultures and hospitality.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 July 2020: CIO registration
- TABLE TALK FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel James Wade | Chair | 27 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Penfold-Attride | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Craig | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Laura Pace | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Luke Taylor | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Patrick Webster | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adhum Carter Wolde-Lule | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tamara Jane Roberts | Trustee | 27 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jason Edge | Trustee | 27 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.12k | £140.54k | £314.79k | £209.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.68k | £103.72k | £196.25k | £413.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 20 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 20 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 05 October 2022 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 05 October 2022 | 127 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Jul 2020 as amended on 01 Oct 2024 as amended on 27 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, IN FOOD AND NUTRITION SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR KNOWLEDGE, PRACTICAL SKILLS AND UNDERSTANDING OF FOOD, FOOD ORIGINS, FOOD FROM DIFFERENT CULTURES AND HOSPITALITY. 2) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 QUEEN SQUARE
LONDON
WC1N 3AR
- Phone:
- 07795033060
- Email:
- info@prept.foundation
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window