Accounts and annual returns CHESTER LE STREET DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 516247
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 19 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 19 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 25 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 25 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 19 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 28 December 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 10 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 10 January 2006 On Time