Financial history CHESTER LE STREET DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 516247
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £92.28k £104.25k £142.81k £164.02k £158.32k
Total expenditure £89.79k £95.02k £113.47k £142.54k £158.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A