THE SHARIF FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit the relief of sickness and the preservation and protection of good health among those suffering from diabetes mellitus by the provision of: a) Medical devices including but limited to, insulin pumps, CGM systems and glucometers, and; b) Grants to enable medical devices including but not limited to, insulin pumps, CGM systems & glucometers to be provided.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 03 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 November 2020: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Ala Sharif | Chair | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Zayd Sharif | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hiam Aldroubi | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 03/07/2021 | 03/07/2022 | 03/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.75k | £52 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £100 | £100 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 July 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 18 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 July 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 18 days | |
Annual return | 03 July 2023 | 01 January 2025 | 243 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 July 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 July 2021 | 19 April 2023 | 351 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 July 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03 JUL 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14 OCT 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG THOSE SUFFERING FROM DIABETES MELLITUS BY THE PROVISION OF: (A) MEDICAL DEVICES INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, INSULIN PUMPS, CONTINUOUS GLUCOSE MONITORING SYSTEMS AND GLUCOMETERS, AND; (B) GRANTS TO ENABLE MEDICAL DEVICES INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, INSULIN PUMPS, CONTINUOUS GLUCOSE MONITORING SYSTEMS AND GLUCOMETERS TO BE PROVIDED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 PAULTONS SQUARE
LONDON
SW3 5DT
- Phone:
- 02074074030
- Email:
- info@theshariffoundation.org
- Website:
-
theshariffoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window