BENTLEY BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities - Sunday services, prayer and smaller group meetings, various outreach events. Weekly Foodbank - Providing food to those in the local community in need. Renew Centre - A place where people in the community can meet. Open the Book - Outreach into schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Doncaster
Governance
- 09 July 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Mark Humphris | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Simpson | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joel David Ward | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Lorraine Alexandra Jackson | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Stuart McKenzie Simpson | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Amelia Bellerby | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Henry Bellerby | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.03k | £89.71k | £98.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.51k | £88.97k | £116.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.70k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE:- 3.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. 3.1.2 THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BENTLEY BAPTIST CHURCH
ASKERN ROAD
BENTLEY
DONCASTER
DN5 0EW
- Phone:
- 01302876401
- Email:
- admin@bbcdoncaster.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window