ABDUL RAHIM FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- India
Governance
- 12 October 2020: CIO registration
- AR FOUNDATION (Working name)
- ARF (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RANA KADIRI | Trustee | 09 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Shabbir Kadiri | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Mohammed Bilal Kadiri | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Sharifa Kadiri | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Hina Kadiri | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 130 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 130 days | |
Annual return | 01 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 496 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 496 days | |
Annual return | 01 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 861 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 861 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF WATER AND SANITATION FACILITIES TO THOSE IN POVERTY B) PROVIDING ITEMS, SERVICES AND GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND OTHER CHARITIES/ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY C) PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL RELATED NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT 2. THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH BY PROVIDING SUPPORT FOR PROJECTS THAT IMPROVE HEALTHCARE FACILITIES OR TREATMENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 ALNESS ROAD
MANCHESTER
M16 8HL
- Phone:
- 07525436862
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window