BIG BROTHERS BIG SISTERS UK FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Big Brothers Big Sisters UK is a national charity enabling long term mentoring relationships of children at risk by a trusted adult. The aim is to help children fulfill their potential. It has brought the model from the US and adapted for the UK context. We work in partnership to fulfill our objectives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 19 October 2020: Standard registration
- BBBS UK (Working name)
- BIG BROTHERS BIG SISTERS UK (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICHOLAS WEBSTER BOOTH | Chair | 11 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Paul Gibbs | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Butler | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Shear | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.00k | £70.50k | £77.50k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.00k | £72.22k | £85.12k | £13.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 17 May 2023 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 17 May 2023 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 05 May 2022 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 05 May 2022 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 JUN 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15 OCT 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION BY PROVIDING OR SUPPORTING THE PROVISION OF MENTORING AND SUPPORT FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Wingfield Close
Ewelme
WALLINGFORD
Oxfordshire
OX10 6JY
- Phone:
- 07528218489
- Email:
- nicholaswbooth@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window