10 COUNT BOXING GYM CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
10 Count Boxing Gym is predominately an amateur boxing club which also organises activities for local children, adults and disabled children in order to introduce them to sport and fitness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £450 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 08 October 2020: CIO registration
- TEN COUNT BOXING & FITNESS CENTRE (Working name)
- TEN COUNT GYM (Working name)
- TEN COUNT FITNESS CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD DENNIS MAXWELL | Chair | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
RYAN JOHNA SMITH | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ANTHONY LEWIN | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE MARIE MATTHEWS | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.37k | £141.42k | £117.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.68k | £119.10k | £112.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.74k | £63.51k | £450 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 01 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 01 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: A) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF STOKE-ON-TRENT AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR AMATEUR BOXING. B) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS RESIDING IN STOKE-ON-TRENT AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Winchester Halls
Winchester Avenue
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST2 0LL
- Phone:
- 07856750283
- Email:
- tencountboxingcio@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window