THE COLNE OPERATIC SOCIETY

Charity Number: 516258
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To educate the public in the dramatic and operatic arts and to further the development of public appreciation and taste of the said arts.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £50,962
Total expenditure: £47,393

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 August 1985: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • PENDLE HIPPODROME THEATRE COMPANY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEVAN MANLEY Chair 24 February 2015
PENDLE HIPPODROME THEATRE LIMITED
Received: On time
Catherine Cox Trustee 20 February 2024
None on record
Richard David Sanderson Trustee 20 February 2024
None on record
Alice Mary Birt Trustee 20 February 2024
None on record
Ian Pilkington Trustee 15 March 2023
None on record
PAUL SMITH THOMPSON Trustee 15 March 2023
PENDLE HIPPODROME THEATRE LIMITED
Received: On time
Karl Pilkington Trustee 27 August 2019
None on record
Marilyn McGinty Trustee 26 February 2019
None on record
LISA MANLEY Trustee 26 February 2019
None on record
David Smith Trustee 21 February 2017
None on record
LEISA ARLEEN CHADWICK Trustee 25 February 2014
None on record
STEPHEN BURROWS Trustee 25 February 2014
None on record
HELEN LOUISE NELSON Trustee 01 June 2011
None on record
MR JOE WHITTAM Trustee
PENDLE HIPPODROME THEATRE LIMITED
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £36.96k £3.95k £1.74k £43.93k £50.96k
Total expenditure £30.74k £11.08k £1.74k £32.28k £47.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 27 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 27 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 12 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
35
Willaston Avenue Blacko
Blacko
Nelson
Lancashire
BB9 6LU
Phone:
07799268551