Trustees THE COLNE OPERATIC SOCIETY
Charity number: 516258

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEVAN MANLEY | Chair | 24 February 2015 |
|
|||||
Catherine Cox | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard David Sanderson | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alice Mary Birt | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Pilkington | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAUL SMITH THOMPSON | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Karl Pilkington | Trustee | 27 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn McGinty | Trustee | 26 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
LISA MANLEY | Trustee | 26 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Smith | Trustee | 21 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
LEISA ARLEEN CHADWICK | Trustee | 25 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN BURROWS | Trustee | 25 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
HELEN LOUISE NELSON | Trustee | 01 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR JOE WHITTAM | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.