DEAF UNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a deaf-led, UK focused charity that works to empower, nurture and train deaf individuals. We have a strong focus on providing information and training to youths and graduates to ensure they have a fighting chance to achieve their goals. We also have a strong research focus, to better understand the challenges facing deaf and disabled people and the solutions that are needed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £8,996 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 August 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kirsty Laura Neale | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Bassim Baz | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Alexandra Ruth Marchesi | Trustee | 08 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Paul Ntulila | Trustee | 17 August 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Stephen William Spencer Norton | Trustee | 17 August 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.37k | £89.37k | £115.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.41k | £66.28k | £104.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £9.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
1. TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF DEAF AND HARD OF HEARING PEOPLE ACROSS ENGLAND AND WALES IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY; 2. THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF DISABILITY AND BY FOSTERING UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN THE DEAF COMMUNITY AND WIDER SOCIETY; AND 3. THE PROMOTION OF THE SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG DEAF AND HARD OF HEARING PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF BEING DEAF BY: A) PROVIDING EDUCATION AND INFORMATION TO SUPPORT AND ENABLE DEAF PARENTS TO MAXIMISE EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES FOR THEIR CHILDREN AND THEMSELVES; B) RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES AFFECTING DEAF PARENTS AND THEIR CHILDREN, BOTH GENERALLY AND IN RELATION TO THEIR SOCIAL EXCLUSION; C) PROVIDING OTHER GENERAL SUPPORT INCLUDING ACCESS TO TRANSLATORS AND INTERPRETERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Deaf Unity
Office 75652
PO Box 6945
LONDON
W1A 6US
- Phone:
- 07999024496
- Email:
- hello@deafunity.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window