THE ROBIN MACLEOD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust has general charitable obectives. The trustees will consider awarding grants to registered charities and where appropriate individuals; that can demonstrate that support is required and will be used in the most effective way to benefit others. The trust focuses on advancement of health, poverty, refugees, homelessness and animal welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 November 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Melanie Macleod | Chair | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael James Alfie MacLeod | Trustee | 16 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Gabrielle Fay MacLeod | Trustee | 22 January 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.08m | £346.19k | £12.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £418.12k | £781.92k | £277.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.08m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £326 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.96k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £418.12k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £10.76k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £407.37k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 10 March 2023 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 10 March 2023 | 100 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 JAN 2020 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 24 AUG 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Robin MacLeod Charitable Trust
att of: Gina Parker
30-32 LOMBARD STREET
LONDON
EC3V 9BQ
- Phone:
- 01133888268
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window