SCAR COVER UP FREEDOM FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SCUFF provides funding for tattoos to cover self-harm scars for those who cannot afford it, training in self-harm crisis management for those caring for people who are self-harming and we will be offering peer support for people struggling with self-harm
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannah Emma Wiltshire | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Louise Blackwell | Trustee | 27 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Louise Bateman-Brown | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.39k | £12.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.48k | £19.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 302 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 302 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 11 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 11 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WHO SELF-HARM BY PROVIDING ACCESS TO SCAR COVER UP PROCEDURES, INFORMATION, ADVICE AND SUPPORT AND SUCH OTHER SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Scar Cover Up Freedom Fund
2 Burnett Street
BRADFORD
West Yorkshire
BD1 5AP
- Phone:
- 01535680696
- Email:
- admin@scuff.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window