THE SKYE HIGH FOUNDATION LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity objects are the relief of those in need, by reason of youth, age, ill-health, disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage, particularly, but not exclusively, parents who are bereaved due to multiple birth child loss, by the provision of butterfly memory packs, grants, education on bereavement, advice and signposting, raising awareness on multiple birth child loss.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 August 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emily Cann | Chair | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Bath | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Heather O'Sullivan | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emily Lewis | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lewis Cann | Trustee | 19 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.01k | £28.06k | £19.59k | £36.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.91k | £4.95k | £42.79k | £35.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 JUL 2019
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘OBJECTS’) ARE THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PARENTS, WHO ARE BEREAVED DUE TO MULTIPLE BIRTH CHILD LOSS, BY THE PROVISION OF; • BUTTERFLY MEMORY PACKS AND GRANTS • EDUCATION ON BEREAVEMENT, ADVICE AND SIGNPOSTING • RAISING AWARENESS ON MULTIPLE BIRTH CHILD LOSS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 PERCY STREET
FITZROVIA
LONDON
W1T 2DQ
- Phone:
- 02074584772
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window