CAT WATCH RESCUE SHELTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CWRS helps abandoned/injured/stray cats across Wilts, Hants and further. We run a TNR programme to help with the unowned cat communities. We also help people with requirements of rehoming or neutering. We offer free advice and guidance on cats and signpost to other areas should we not be able to answer. We also find new homes for strays after medical treatment has been completed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 26 November 2020: CIO registration
- CAT WATCH WILTS RESCUE (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marnie Jane Buckland | Chair | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Greenwood | Trustee | 07 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lorna Claire Irish | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Glen Simpson | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Vranch RVN | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marissa Best | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.30k | £149.21k | £174.54k | £155.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.94k | £123.52k | £137.72k | £159.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £37.48k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Nov 2020 as amended on 21 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF CATS AND KITTENS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE RESCUE AND REHOMING FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH CATS AND KITTENS
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 LYNCHETS ROAD
AMESBURY
SALISBURY
SP4 7JA
- Phone:
- 07305415900
- Email:
- info@cwwrescue.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window