GAM MED (GAMBIA MEDICAL UK PARTNERSHIP)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping raise the standards of healthcare in the Gambia
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- The Gambia
Governance
- 16 September 2020: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
james gibbs | Chair | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr antonio Perello Sancho | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Leonard | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rosie Scott | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Graham Dodge | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.00k | £17.00k | £14.00k | £16.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.00k | £17.00k | £13.50k | £15.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 September 2024 | 223 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21 AUG 2019
Charitable objects
“TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE HEALTH OF PATIENTS ACROSS THE GAMBIA, BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, MEDICINES, SUPPORT SERVICES (INCLUDING EDUCATION) AND EQUIPMENT NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES CONCENTRATED AROUND ORTHOPAEDICS, PLASTIC SURGERY, ANAESTHESIA AND RADIOLOGY THROUGH A UK AND GAMBIAN PARTNERSHIP”.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Willow Croft
Lower Station Road
HENFIELD
BN5 9UR
- Phone:
- 07980843265
- Email:
- jamesrgibbs@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window