DARTFORD MASJID AND ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Datrtford masjid and Islamic centre
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
23 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 November 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tuha Ahmed Choudhury | Chair | 28 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Litur Rahman | Trustee | 28 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
ABDUL KADIR | Trustee | 28 August 2020 |
|
|||||
Mujahid Jaigirdar | Trustee | 28 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Muhammed Anisul Haque | Trustee | 28 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £184.19k | £163.37k | £297.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.27k | £10.06k | £18.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
19 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 06 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN DARTFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A MOSQUE OR MASJID, THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, AND THE PRODUCTION AND/OR DISTRIBUTION OF LITERATURE ON THE ISLAMIC RELIGION TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE ISLAMIC RELIGION
Area of benefit
DARTFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
2
WESTGATE
DARTFORD
DA1 2AR
- Phone:
- 01322314820
- Email:
- dmic921@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window