HELP CLOSE BY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provider of software and technological solutions for the relief of poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £9,800 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 July 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucy Webster | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rashida Gandhi | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anjali Avnee Parshotam | Trustee | 02 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Inderjit Singh Sidhu | Trustee | 02 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Jasmin Robson | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Catterall-Mason | Trustee | 30 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £147 | £863 | £22.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £847 | £1.63k | £6.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £9.80k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
1. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE UK BY PROVIDING TECHNOLOGICAL SOLUTIONS AND TECHNOLOGY SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES; WORKING IN PARTNERSHIP WITH STATUTORY AND OTHER RELEVANT ORGANISATIONS AS APPROPRIATE. 2. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE LIVING OR WORKING IN THE UK BY PROVIDING TECHNOLOGICAL APPLICATIONS FREE OF CHARGE TO SUCH PERSONS AS WOULD BENEFIT FROM BEING CONNECTED WITH LOCAL CHARITABLE SERVICE PROVIDERS TO OBTAIN HELP WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Tennal Road
BIRMINGHAM
B32 2JE
- Phone:
- 07710415993
- Email:
- duncan@helpcloseby.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window