PARKFIELDS COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Parkfields Community Centre manages a building and surrounding grounds, which are owned by the Presbyterian Church of Wales. It serves the community by letting out rooms at affordable rates for activity, learning, entertainment and other services. In addition it runs projects for children and young people and a Food Hub that includes a Community Fridge.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £360 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Flintshire
Governance
- 25 August 2020: CIO registration
- 17 February 2022: Funds received from 502467 PARKFIELDS COMMUNITY CENTRE
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David John Jones | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Charles Pratt Mr | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Esther Andrews | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Corey Hampton | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Megan Lloyd Hughes Dr | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tina Susan Claydon | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANDREA MEARNS | Trustee | 12 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Catherine Diana Jones | Trustee | 12 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Roberts | Trustee | 25 August 2020 |
|
|||||
PATRICK OLIVER | Trustee | 25 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Haydn Jones | Trustee | 25 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.14k | £60.07k | £53.67k | £74.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.67k | £56.04k | £59.28k | £79.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £1.17k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.49k | N/A | £2.27k | £360 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF MOLD, AS A PRACTICAL EXPRESSION OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BUT ON A NON-SECTARIAN BASIS AND WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Parkfields Community Centre
Ash Grove
MOLD
CH7 1TB
- Phone:
- 01352756337
- Email:
- parkfieldsccmold@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window