HASTINGS PHILHARMONIC ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We deliver concerts (orchestral, choral, ensemble, chamber choir), recitals (wind, string & piano quintets, quartets and trios, vocal solo and duets), and opera performances and community projects, as well as free workshops and masterclasses for school children, a free children's choir and concerts and free open-air family concerts and pop-up public concerts in Hastings and the surrounding towns.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £50,250 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 September 2020: CIO registration
- HASTINGS PHILHARMONIC (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Carolyn May | Chair | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Philpott | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laetitia Yhap | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Anne Carroll-Marshall | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Hoffmann | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caryl Hosein | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Read | Trustee | 25 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Cormack | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen May da Silva | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marcio Tadeu Lemos Paes Goncalves May da Silva | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.10k | £199.44k | £162.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.30k | £186.49k | £180.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £18.07k | £36.51k | £50.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE ART OF CLASSICAL MUSIC FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN HASTINGS AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC ORCHESTRAL CONCERTS, PERFORMANCES AND RECITALS AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
81 Battle Road
ST. LEONARDS-ON-SEA
East Sussex
TN37 7AB
- Phone:
- 07428297480
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window