GREATER MANCHESTER ECZEMA & SKIN SUPPORT CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GMESS aims to promote and protect the physical and mental health of sufferers of eczema and other inflammatory skin conditions in Greater Manchester through the provision of support, education and practical advice. Also to advance the education of the general public in all areas relating to eczema and other inflammatory skin conditions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 12 June 2020: CIO registration
- GMESS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Paul Kweeday | Chair | 04 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARCELLA ANGELA TURNER | Trustee | 28 August 2020 |
|
|||||
Muhammad Aurangzeb Shaikh | Trustee | 04 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.30k | £0 | £19.47k | £22.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.13k | £6.16k | £8.02k | £16.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 May 2024 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 May 2024 | 118 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 January 2023 | 343 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF ECZEMA AND OTHER INFLAMMATORY SKIN CONDITIONS IN GREATER MANCHESTER THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO ECZEMA AND OTHER INFLAMMATORY SKIN CONDITIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Zion Community Resource Centre
339 Stretford Road
Hulme
Manchester
M15 4ZY
- Phone:
- 07872902300
- Email:
- hello@gmess.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window