TRYSULL AND SEISDON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide a room for the community to use for education, sports, arts, social uses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 16 April 1985: Standard registration
- TRYSULL AND VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WENDY BAGLEY | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR JOE HARPER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR VAN FRENCH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JOSIE STEVENSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.25k | £13.10k | £20.77k | £9.92k | £11.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.90k | £7.09k | £9.18k | £8.97k | £22.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £16.34k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST AND TRUST DEED DATED 5 JUNE 1984
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE UE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES OF TRYSULL AND SEISDON IN THE COUNTY OF STAFFORDSHIRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLIDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FRMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
TRYSULL AND SEISDON IN THE COUNTY OF STAFFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 FEIASHILL CLOSE
TRYSULL
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV5 7JQ
- Phone:
- 01902894881
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window