THE EDITH AND JACK GRIFFITHS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing financial assistance within the Warwickshire area, to or for the benefit of such exclusively charitable institution or institutions purpose or purposes in such shares between them (if more than one) with power to apply the whole or any part or parts of such income for all or any one or more to the exclusion of the others as the Trustees shall from time to time think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 19 April 1985: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Felix Henshaw White | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT NICHOLAS BUTTON | Trustee | 21 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROGER VINCENT WIGLESWORTH DL FRICS | Trustee |
|
||||||
JEFFREY VEREKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £117.83k | £17.84k | £17.77k | £18.26k | £186.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.98k | £83.85k | £35.66k | £33.28k | £43.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 06 June 2024 | 122 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15 MARCH 1985.
Charitable objects
TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABALE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS PURPOSE OR PURPOSES (INCLUDING THOE REFERRED TO IN THE SECOND SCHEDULE) IN SUCH SHARES BETWEEN THEM (IF MORE THAN ONE) WITH POWER TO APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OR PARTS OF SUCH INCOME FOR ALL OR ANY ONE OR MORE TO THE EXCLUSION OF THE OTHERS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL WITH THE CONSENT OF THE PATRON FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Park Road
LEAMINGTON SPA
Warwickshire
CV32 6LG
- Phone:
- 01926887396
- Email:
- rnbutton@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window