MASA: MEN AGAINST SEXUAL ABUSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
our aim is to give support to men who have been sexually abused and there families in the south west of England which will cover Cornwall, Devon, Dorset and Somerset
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income includes £5,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Dorset
- Somerset
Governance
- 14 July 2020: CIO registration
- MASA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Antony PHILP | Chair | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Helen Ledger | Trustee | 11 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Derek Wiley | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.04k | £60.83k | £32.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.51k | £30.00k | £31.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £11.66k | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 02 June 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 02 June 2023 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO RELIEVE THE EMOTIONAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL DISTRESS OF ADULT MEN IN NEED, BY REASON OF SEXUAL ABUSE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR, THOSE RESIDING IN CORNWALL; Ò BY THE PROVISION OF A WELCOMING SAFE SPACE TO MEET. Ò BY THE REGULAR WEEKLY PROVISION OF PROFESSIONALLY LED, GROUP THERAPY AND SUPPORT. Ò BY PAYING FOR ONE-TO-ONE, SPECIALIST COUNSELLING THERAPY, FOR THOSE MEN WHO WOULD LIKE TO JOIN A SUPPORT GROUP, BUT WHO, BECAUSE OF ON-GOING TRAUMA, ARE NOT YET WELL-ENOUGH TO SAFELY ENGAGE WITHIN A GROUP SETTING. Ò BY EXTENDING THE PROVISION OF PROFESSIONALLY LED, GROUP THERAPY AND SUPPORT, AND, WHERE APPROPRIATE, ONE-TO-ONE SPECIALIST COUNSELLING; INITIALLY TO DIFFERENT AREAS OF CORNWALL, AND, LONGER TERM, TO OTHER COUNTIES IN THE SOUTH WEST OF ENGLAND, WHERE SUCH PROVISION IS ABSENT. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH ENGLISH LAW
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fore Street Business Hub
50 Fore Street
BODMIN
Cornwall
PL31 2HL
- Phone:
- 07936820469
- Website:
-
masamenagainstsexualabuse.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window