WE ARE FARMING MINDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preserve & protect good mental health for the public benefit within the farming community in Herefordshire by providing events, information, advice & support designed to raise awareness of mental health issues, remove the stigma of mental health & encourage those suffering with poor mental health to seek appropriate help and treatment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 24 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suzanne Jones | Chair | 12 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martha Rudge | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Louise Brewer | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Harding | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emily Stables | Trustee | 12 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Stables | Trustee | 12 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.18k | £137.51k | £216.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.47k | £85.99k | £137.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £44.32k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Sep 2020 as amended on 26 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD MENTAL HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITHIN THE FARMING COMMUNITY IN HEREFORDSHIRE BY: A) PROVIDING EVENTS, INFORMATION, ADVICE AND SUPPORT DESIGNED TO RAISE AWARENESS OF MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES AND REMOVE THE STIGMA OF MENTAL HEALTH AND ENCOURAGE THOSE SUFFERING WITH POOR MENTAL HEALTH TO SEEK APPROPRIATE HELP AND TREATMENT. B) PROVIDING MENTAL HEALTH TRAINING TO VETS AND ANIMAL FEED AND HEALTH REPS IN HEREFORDSHIRE TO EQUIP THEM WITH THE SKILLS REQUIRED TO IDENTIFY PEOPLE WHO ARE EXPERIENCING MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES AND OFFER INITIAL SUPPORT; C) SIGNPOSTING TO LOCAL PROFESSIONAL COUNSELLING SERVICES WHERE NECESSARY AND ASSISTING WITH THE COSTS OF TREATMENT WHERE APPROPRIATE; D) PROVIDING A CARERS’ SUPPORT GROUP FOR THOSE CARING FOR PARTNERS/RELATIVES WITH MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
KINGS PITTS FARM
KINGSTHORNE
HEREFORD
KINGS PITTS FARM
ACONBURY
HR2 8AQ
- Phone:
- 07506567500
- Email:
- wearefarmingminds@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window