DHARMA ENDOWMENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A charitable endowment fund that seeks to ensure donor's funds are utilised for Dharmic philanthropic purposes in perpetuity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 29 July 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rishi Singh | Chair | 18 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Atma Krishna | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nitesh Gor | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Roshan Patel | Trustee | 08 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
KISHAN PAUN | Trustee | 18 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £88.00k | £1.39k | £1.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £800 | £9.82k | £88.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 December 2022 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 December 2022 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 DEC 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28 JUL 2021
Charitable objects
4.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO: 4.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE VEDIC RELIGION, IN PARTICULAR PROMOTING ITS PHILOSOPHY AND CULTURE; 4.1.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AT PRIMARY, SECONDARY AND TERTIARY LEVELS; 4.1.3 THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY; 4.1.4 THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH, NUTRITION AND PROGRAMMES DESIGNED TO IMPROVE FITNESS, PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING, BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND OTHER FORMS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO CHARITIES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO FURTHER ANY OR ALL OF THESE OBJECTS.”
Contact information
- Address:
-
3rd Floor
45 Albemarle Street
LONDON
W1S 4JL
- Phone:
- 07804944121
- Email:
- info@dharmafund.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window