THE SERCO PEOPLE FUND

Charity Number: 1194113
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Serco People Fund supports Serco colleagues and their close families facing extraordinary financial challenges. The People Fund embraces Serco's value of Care, providing support to colleagues and their families in times of need. As an independent charity we do this by providing grants in response to applications from colleagues and, where helpful, connecting them to other assistance.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £144,898
Total expenditure: £468,581

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Australia

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 April 2021: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID CHARLES EVELEIGH Chair 16 April 2021
THE SERCO FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Sarah Bartram Trustee 18 November 2024
None on record
Stevie-Louise Williams Trustee 05 August 2024
None on record
Mark Withecombe Trustee 09 October 2023
None on record
Thomas Walton Trustee 09 October 2023
None on record
Jacqueline Planner Trustee 28 September 2022
None on record
ALEX FERGUSON Trustee 04 April 2022
None on record
STEPHEN JAMES GRASSBY Trustee 16 April 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £4.06m £144.90k
Total expenditure £198.95k £468.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £4.05m N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A
Income - Investment £5.36k N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £198.95k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £23.28k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 09 August 2024 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 09 August 2024 10 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 30 August 2023 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 30 August 2023 31 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SERCO GROUP PLC
SERCO HOUSE
16 BARTLEY WOOD BUSINESS PARK
BARTLEY WAY
HOOK
RG27 9UY
Phone:
0345 010 4000