FIRST ART

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the arts for the public benefit in Nottinghamshire and Derbyshire primarily, and the Midlands region, nationally and internationally in the forms of collaborative arts, contemporary visual arts, performance, music, drama, poetry, craft, media arts and all other associated arts of the highest quality and calibre
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £11,175 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 05 February 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY TRAFFORD | Chair | 05 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Mohammed Ismail Hossen Khokon | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Anguish | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH BARRETT | Trustee | 05 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
SUSHRI WELLS | Trustee | 05 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Phillip Hargreaves | Trustee | 05 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £426.60k | £253.31k | £276.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £414.26k | £212.87k | £303.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £355.52k | £237.50k | £11.18k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN NOTTINGHAMSHIRE AND DERBYSHIRE PRIMARILY, AND THE MIDLANDS REGION, NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY IN THE FORMS OF COLLABORATIVE ARTS, CONTEMPORARY VISUAL ARTS, PERFORMANCE, MUSIC, DRAMA, POETRY, CRAFT, MEDIA ARTS AND ALL OTHER ASSOCIATED ARTS OF THE HIGHEST QUALITY AND CALIBRE BY: (A) ENCOURAGING AND DEVELOPING PUBLIC PARTICIPATION IN THESE ART FORMS BY THE PRESENTATION OF ARTWORKS, WORKSHOPS, COMMISSIONS, CONCERTS, PERFORMANCES, EXHIBITIONS AND FESTIVALS; (B) SUPPORTING COMMUNITY COHESION, WELL-BEING AND CAPACITY BUILDING THROUGH THE COMMISSIONING OF COLLABORATIVE ARTS PROJECTS ADDRESSING ISSUES OF PLACE, COMMUNITY AND EQUALITY AND INCLUSION; AND (C) PROMOTING, SUPPORTING AND DEVELOPING OPPORTUNITIES FOR COMMUNITIES IN THEIR LOCALITIES TO BE INSPIRED AND EMPOWERED TO PRODUCE, SHAPE AND DELIVER COMMUNITY ACTIVITIES AND ENTERPRISES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 55
Four Seasons Shopping Centre
Mansfield
NG18 1SU
- Phone:
- 01909720378
- Email:
- info@firstart.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window