WORCESTERSHIRE GUILD OF WEAVERS, SPINNERS AND DYERS

Charity Number: 516312
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To inform and increase knowledge of textiles in the fields of spinning, weaving and dyeing to help maintain the continued use of these crafts.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £1,196
Total expenditure: £1,129

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 April 1985: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Julia Berry Chair 10 February 2018
None on record
Hannah De Lisle Trustee 09 July 2022
None on record
Kim Neale Trustee 09 July 2022
None on record
Claire Ashbourne Trustee 09 July 2022
None on record
Sandra Phillips Trustee 12 February 2022
WYRE FOREST & DISTRICT UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Received: On time
Christine Harris Trustee 13 February 2021
None on record
Myfanwy Elizabeth Jean Baldwin Trustee 13 February 2021
None on record
Anne Cheston Trustee 09 February 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.95k £750 £50 £434 £1.20k
Total expenditure £1.47k £327 £478 £492 £1.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Ryall Hill House
Ryall Lane
Ryall
Upton-upon-Severn
WORCESTER
WR8 0PN
Phone:
01684 594646